NC H1156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Ch. SL 2020-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Caswell Cty/Referendum on Countywide Zoning
Title
Caswell Cty/Referendum on Countywide Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Graig Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Ch. SL 2020-22 | |
2020-06-19 | Ratified | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2020-06-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Filed |