NC H1136 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Executive Branch Revolving Door.
Title
Executive Branch Revolving Door.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Ethics, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1136 |