NC H113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary 2
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary 2
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
2021 AOC Legislative Changes.-AB
Title
2021 AOC Legislative Changes.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 2 |
2021-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-02 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aoc
Appointments
Chief Justice
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Commissions
Court Of Appeals
Courts
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Dispute Resolution Comn.
Dispute Settlement Centers
Ethics
General Assembly
Health Services
Judges
Judicial Dept.
Judicial Standards Comn.
Juries
Liability
Magistrates
Malpractice
Mediation & Arbitration
Membership
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Supreme Court
Vacancies
Appointments
Chief Justice
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Commissions
Court Of Appeals
Courts
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Dispute Resolution Comn.
Dispute Settlement Centers
Ethics
General Assembly
Health Services
Judges
Judicial Dept.
Judicial Standards Comn.
Juries
Liability
Magistrates
Malpractice
Mediation & Arbitration
Membership
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Supreme Court
Vacancies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 239 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 310 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 339.70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
122C | 268 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 101.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 1011 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 245 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 304 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 305 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 511 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 532 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 601 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 941 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
1A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1C | 1603 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42 | 34.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
50B | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
50C | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
50C | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
51 | 5.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
7A | 20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 343.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 375 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 38.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 38.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 38.3B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 47.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 49.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1906 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
9 | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |