NC H112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Roanoke Rapids Local Option Sales Tax
Title
Roanoke Rapids Local Option Sales Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-07-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-20 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |