NC H111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Ch. SL 2017-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Ch. SL 2017-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Service by Publication Cost
Title
Winston-Salem/Service by Publication Cost
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Ch. SL 2017-20 | |
2017-05-30 | Ratified | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-03-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S51 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance