NC H110 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Ch. SL 2021-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Landlord Submission of HOPE Application

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord Submission of HOPE Application

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09 Ch. SL 2021-190
2021-12-09 Signed by Gov. 12/9/2021
2021-11-30 Pres. To Gov. 11/30/2021
2021-11-30 Ratified
2021-11-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-11-29HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-11-29SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-11-29SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-11-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-11-29HouseConf Com Reported
2021-11-29SenateConf Com Reported
2021-11-28SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-11-25HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-10-20HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2021-10-18HousePlaced On Cal For 10/20/2021
2021-10-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-09-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-09-09HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-09-09SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-09-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-07SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-31SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-31SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-27SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-24HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-17HousePlaced On Cal For 03/23/2021
2021-03-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-03-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-16HousePlaced On Cal For 03/17/2021
2021-03-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-16HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-04HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-03-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-19HouseRef to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143(n/a)Citation Text
143138(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H110
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H110v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/966/0/H110-PCS10099-BV-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52942/0/H110-PCS30472-BB-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53543/0/H110-PCCS10550-BB-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBV-7(CSBV-3)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBV-6(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMTM-15(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMTU-11(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBB-48(CSBB-14)-v-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBB-51(e3)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBB-55(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H110-SMBB-55(sl)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/40
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/43
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/447
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/543
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/523
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/586

Bill Comments

feedback