NC H1096 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Ch. Res 2018-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Ch. Res 2018-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirm Athena Brooks/Special SC Judge
Title
Confirm Athena Brooks/Special SC Judge
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Ch. Res 2018-7 |
2018-06-29 | Ratified | |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2018 |
2018-06-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2018 |
2018-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-26 | House | Reptd Without Prejudice |
2018-06-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-25 | House | Filed |