NC H1086 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Ch. SL 2014-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Ch. SL 2014-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC and SC Rail Compact
Title
NC and SC Rail Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-15 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Ch. SL 2014-121 | |
2014-09-20 | Became Law w/o Signature | |
2014-08-15 | Pres. To Gov. 8/15/2014 | |
2014-08-15 | Ratified | |
2014-08-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-15 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-08-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-08-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-31 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-31 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-06-05 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-19 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Filed |