NC H1076 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alamance/Guilford Boundary Line
Title
Alamance/Guilford Boundary Line
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] | Rep. Cecil Brockman [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-61 | |
2018-06-25 | Ratified | |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-01 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2018-06-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-31 | House | Filed |