NC H1061 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Currituck County Game Commission/Licensing
Title
Currituck County Game Commission/Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-19 | |
2022-06-29 | Ratified | |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Commissions
Counties
Currituck County
Fish & Wildlife
Hunting & Fishing
Lakes & Rivers
Licenses & Permits
Local
Ratified
Session Laws
Transportation
Water Resources
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Commissions
Counties
Currituck County
Fish & Wildlife
Hunting & Fishing
Lakes & Rivers
Licenses & Permits
Local
Ratified
Session Laws
Transportation
Water Resources