NC H1057 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Ch. SL 2022-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Ch. SL 2022-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mitchell/Hickory-Conover/Buncombe OT Changes
Title
Mitchell/Hickory-Conover/Buncombe OT Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Ch. SL 2022-40 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2022-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Asheville
Authorities
Beer & Wine
Buncombe County
Catawba County
Chaptered
City Councils
Conover
Corporations
Counties
County Commissioners
Definitions
Hickory
Hotels & Motels
Local
Local Government
Manufacturing
Mitchell County
Municipalities
Nonprofit
Occupancy
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Rentals & Leasing
Session Laws
Taxation
Taxes
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Wineries & Breweries
Asheville
Authorities
Beer & Wine
Buncombe County
Catawba County
Chaptered
City Councils
Conover
Corporations
Counties
County Commissioners
Definitions
Hickory
Hotels & Motels
Local
Local Government
Manufacturing
Mitchell County
Municipalities
Nonprofit
Occupancy
Ratified
Religion & Religious Institutions
Rentals & Leasing
Session Laws
Taxation
Taxes
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Wineries & Breweries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | 155 | (n/a) | Citation Text |