NC H1056 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ret. & Treasury Admin. Changes Act of 2022.-AB
Title
Ret. & Treasury Admin. Changes Act of 2022.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-14 | |
2022-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2022 | |
2022-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2022 | |
2022-06-27 | Ratified | |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commissions
Council Of State
Death & Dying
Death Benefits
Disability
Disabled Persons
Emergency Services
Employment
Government Employees
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Lgers
Life
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Workers Compensation
Commissions
Council Of State
Death & Dying
Death Benefits
Disability
Disabled Persons
Emergency Services
Employment
Government Employees
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Lgers
Life
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Workers Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 341.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115D | 25.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116B | 78 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
128 | 23.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 27 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 106 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 5.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 166.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159 | 151 | (n/a) | Citation Text |