NC H1056 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
FAIR 2018.-AB
Title
FAIR 2018.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] | Rep. Andy Dulin [R] |
Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-52 | |
2018-06-25 | House | Became Law W/o Signature |
2018-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018 |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-11 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2018-06-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-31 | House | Filed |