NC H1052 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
PED Report/Student Financial Assistance
Title
PED Report/Student Financial Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D] |
Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-04-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S726 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate