NC H1047 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Welfare Reform/Food and Nutrition Benefits
Title
Welfare Reform/Food and Nutrition Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A5 Insko Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - A4 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-06-15 - House - A3 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - A2 Jones Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - A1 Queen Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-06-16 - House - A5 Insko Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - A4 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-06-15 - House - A3 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - A2 Jones Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - A1 Queen Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2016-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-14 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2016-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2016-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2016-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2016-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Filed |