NC H1045 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mayland CC/Blue Ridge Hotel Transfer Auth
Title
Mayland CC/Blue Ridge Hotel Transfer Auth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-18 | |
2022-06-29 | Ratified | |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Corporations
Counties
Education
Higher Education
Hotels & Motels
Local
Mitchell County
Nonprofit
Property
Property-state Government
Ratified
Sales & Conveyances
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Corporations
Counties
Education
Higher Education
Hotels & Motels
Local
Mitchell County
Nonprofit
Property
Property-state Government
Ratified
Sales & Conveyances
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text |