NC H104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Litter Definition Clarification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Litter Definition Clarification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Transportation
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-20HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S81 (Same As) 2019-02-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback