NC H1037 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Various Judicial Districts Changes
Title
Various Judicial Districts Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A1 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A2 Burr Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A3 Goodman Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A1 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A2 Burr Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - A3 Goodman Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2018-06-04 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-04 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2018 |
2018-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-31 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Filed |