NC H1015 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Placed On Cal For 06/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Chris Ayers/Ex. Dir. Utilities Comm PS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Chris Ayers/Ex. Dir. Utilities Comm PS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2019
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-31SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-30HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-28HousePlaced On Cal For 05/29/2019
2019-05-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-28HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-23HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-23HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-22HouseFiled
2019-05-22HouseReptd Fav. For Introduction

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback