NC H1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Real Property Donation Tax Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property Donation Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-03SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-10-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-01HousePlaced On Cal For 10/02/2019
2019-10-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-01HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-08-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-29HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-25HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback