NC H1006 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Prison Pilot Deadlines
Title
Amend Prison Pilot Deadlines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Emergency Services
Information Technology
Pilot Programs
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Reports
Session Laws
Stem
Emergency Services
Information Technology
Pilot Programs
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Reports
Session Laws
Stem