NC H1005 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Organized Retail Theft
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2022-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S766 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-30
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 538.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 86.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 86.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 86.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15 | 11.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 490 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 491 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 492 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 493 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 494 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 495 | (n/a) | Citation Text |