NC H1001 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on October 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-14 - Ch. SL 2019-229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Raise the Age Funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raise the Age Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of the Chair Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-14 Ch. SL 2019-229
2019-10-14 Signed by Gov. 10/14/2019
2019-10-11 Pres. To Gov. 10/11/2019
2019-10-10 Ratified
2019-10-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-08SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-07SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-10-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-03SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-10-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-01HousePlaced On Cal For 10/02/2019
2019-10-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-01HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-27HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-09-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-27HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-04-29HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S407 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback