NC H100 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Local Government Immigration Compliance
Title
Local Government Immigration Compliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Cleveland Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Cleveland Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Redistricting |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Redistricting Added |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Postponed To 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |