NC H100 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
House Select Comm. on Nonprofits
Title
House Select Comm. on Nonprofits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-16 | Ref To Com On Appropriations | |
2011-02-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Same As) 2011-03-30 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget