MT SJ4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on electioneering
Title
Interim study on electioneering
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Ellis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-01-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-11-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-10-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |