MT SJ31 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of utility decoupling
Title
Interim study of utility decoupling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-04-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-04-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-04-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-10-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |