MT SJ2 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution for Article V of US Constitution convention of states
Title
Resolution for Article V of US Constitution convention of states
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2022-12-07 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2022-11-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-10-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-09-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-09-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-09-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-08-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-07-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |