MT SJ11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution requesting removal of brucella abortus from federal list
Title
Resolution requesting removal of brucella abortus from federal list
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |