MT SJ1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint rules resolution
Title
Joint rules resolution
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - (H) Rules Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - (S) Rules Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - (H) Rules Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - (S) Rules Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-02-07 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-02-06 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-02-06 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Rules |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Rules |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Rules |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Rules |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Rules |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Rules |
2017-01-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Rules |
2017-01-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Rules |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2016-12-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Rules |
2016-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-10 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |