MT SB883 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Judge Pedro R. Hernandez memorial highway
Title
Establish Judge Pedro R. Hernandez memorial highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=883&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/SB0899/SB0883_1.pdf |