MT SB76 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the captive insurance regulatory and supervision account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the captive insurance regulatory and supervision account

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2021-02-24 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-02-24Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-24Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-23 (C) Amendments Available
2021-02-17Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-21Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-21Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-20Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-15Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-12Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-06Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-06Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-06 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-06Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-06Senate(S) Introduced
2021-01-05 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-03 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-31 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2020-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-30 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-30 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-28 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-28 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-28 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-20 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-12-15 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-12-08 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-12-04 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-11-17 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback