MT SB70 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the Quality Educator Loan Assistance Program
Title
Revise the Quality Educator Loan Assistance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-04-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2023-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2023-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2023-02-17 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-01-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-01-17 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-01-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-01-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2022-12-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2022-12-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2022-12-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2022-12-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2022-12-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2022-12-13 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2022-11-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-10-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-10-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-10-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-10-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |