MT SB7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
Pending: Senate Finance and Claims Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Propose an inflationary increase for DD providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Propose an inflationary increase for DD providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2019-01-30Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2019-01-30Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-01-30Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-01-28Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2019-01-25Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2019-01-25Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2019-01-18Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2019-01-17Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-01-16Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-01-14Senate(S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-01-07Senate(S) First Reading
2018-12-21Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2018-11-16 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-11-16Senate(S) Introduced
2018-11-14 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-11-14 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-11-14 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-11-09 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-11-09 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-10-17 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-10-17 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2018-10-12 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-10-09 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-10-09 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-09-14 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback