MT SB7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise Medicaid application process
Title
Revise Medicaid application process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Sponsor List Modified |
2013-01-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2012-12-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2012-11-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2012-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-09-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-09-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-09-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-09-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-09-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-09-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-09-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-06-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |