MT SB56 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal meat and poultry inspection appeals process
Title
Repeal meat and poultry inspection appeals process
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Ellis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-01-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2018-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-29 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |