MT SB56 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise river bed laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise river bed laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Chapter Number Assigned
2015-03-23Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2015-03-20Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-20House(H) Signed by Speaker
2015-03-18Senate(S) Signed by President
2015-03-18Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2015-03-18 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2015-03-18Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2015-03-17House(H) Returned to Senate
2015-03-16House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2015-03-16House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-03-14House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2015-03-14House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-12House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources
2015-03-11House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources
2015-03-09House(H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources
2015-02-07House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources
2015-01-31House(H) First Reading
2015-01-30House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources
2015-01-29Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2015-01-29Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-01-29Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-01-28Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2015-01-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-01-24Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources
2015-01-23Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources
2015-01-12Senate(S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources
2015-01-09Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2015-01-08Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2015-01-05Senate(S) First Reading
2014-12-18Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources
2014-12-16Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2014-12-09 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2014-12-09Senate(S) Introduced
2014-11-21 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2014-11-21 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2014-11-21 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2014-11-20 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2014-11-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2014-11-20 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2014-11-19 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2014-11-19 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-10-30 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-10-30 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-10-30 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2014-10-30 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2014-09-16 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-03-24 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=56&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0099/SB0056_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0099/SB0056_x.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S182&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S198&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1014&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1036&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0056NAS150123.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0056NAH150311.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback