MT SB56 | 2009 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  

Summary

Extend open meeting rights to members of homeowner and landowner associations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend open meeting rights to members of homeowner and landowner associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-28 (S) Died in Standing Committee  
2009-02-26 (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal  
2009-01-28 (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government
2009-01-26 (S) Hearing (S) Local Government
2009-01-05 (S) First Reading  
2008-12-10 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government
2008-12-05 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
2008-12-05 (S) Introduced  
2008-12-02 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent  
2008-12-02 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review  
2008-12-02 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review  
2008-11-13 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically  
2008-11-13 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing  
2008-11-13 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]  
2008-11-13 (C) Draft in Edit  
2008-11-07 (C) Draft in Legal Review  
2008-10-16 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2008-04-22 (C) Draft Request Received  

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback