MT SB534 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment on redistricting
Title
Constitutional amendment on redistricting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-29 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Motion Carried (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Motion Carried (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2023-04-29 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) Motion Carried |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2023-03-27 | Senate | (S) Sponsor List Modified |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-03-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |