MT SB53 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise permitting laws for rock products mining
Title
Revise permitting laws for rock products mining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |