MT SB52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lodging facility use tax and sales tax on lodging and rental cars
Title
Revise lodging facility use tax and sales tax on lodging and rental cars
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2021-01-28 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |