MT SB52 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise captive insurance laws
Title
Revise captive insurance laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postpone Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postpone Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-01-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postpone Motion Failed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2014-12-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-16 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2014-11-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-09-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |