MT SB474 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws pertaining to sports betting
Title
Generally revise laws pertaining to sports betting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-21 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2023-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-22 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |