MT SB47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to river basin councils
Title
Revise laws related to river basin councils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-30 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2018-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-12-03 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |