MT SB465 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Clarify ownership of streambeds concerning property taxation
Title
Clarify ownership of streambeds concerning property taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-17 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House   | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-16 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-01 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-01 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-28 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-03-28 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-03-28 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-03-27 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation | |
2009-03-11 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-13 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft Back for Redo   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=465&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |