MT SB44 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise subdivision laws
Title
Revise subdivision laws
Sponsors
Sen. John Esp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2021-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2021-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2021-01-27 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |