MT SB409 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allow for the condemnation and reacquisition of a mobile home park

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow for the condemnation and reacquisition of a mobile home park

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13Senate(S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2023-02-27Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government
2023-02-27Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government
2023-02-24Senate(S) Hearing Canceled (S) Local Government
2023-02-24Senate(S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) Local Government
2023-02-24Senate(S) Hearing (S) Local Government
2023-02-21Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government
2023-02-20Senate(S) First Reading
2023-02-20 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2023-02-20Senate(S) Introduced
2023-02-16 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2023-02-15 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-15 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2023-02-15 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-15 (C) Draft in Assembly
2023-02-14 (C) Executive Director Review
2023-02-14 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2023-02-14 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2023-02-14 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2023-02-14 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
2023-02-11 (C) Draft in Edit
2023-02-10 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2023-02-08 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2022-11-29 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback