MT SB40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise membership of the Montana Invasive Species Council
Title
Revise membership of the Montana Invasive Species Council
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Ellis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-08 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |