MT SB397 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain diesel engine retrofits that produce excess diesel exhaust
Title
Prohibit certain diesel engine retrofits that produce excess diesel exhaust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2015-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-03-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |