MT SB392 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lodging facility and accommodation use taxes to encourage compliance
Title
Revise lodging facility and accommodation use taxes to encourage compliance
Sponsors
Sen. Dee Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-19 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2015-02-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-19 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-02-14 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |